1 | | - | H.B. No. 33 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Dominguez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 33 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Veteran Affairs & Border Security; April 21, 2021, reported |
---|
| 5 | + | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 21, 2021, |
---|
| 6 | + | sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
9 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 51.3041(b), Education Code, is amended |
---|
11 | 17 | | to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 18 | | (b) An institution of higher education shall consider, in |
---|
13 | 19 | | determining whether to award to a student course credit toward a |
---|
14 | 20 | | degree or certificate offered by the institution for the student's |
---|
15 | 21 | | completion of certain military training: |
---|
16 | 22 | | (1) any official military record presented to the |
---|
17 | 23 | | institution by the student that: |
---|
18 | 24 | | (A) describes the substance of the training |
---|
19 | 25 | | completed by the student; and |
---|
20 | 26 | | (B) verifies the student's successful completion |
---|
21 | 27 | | of that training; and |
---|
22 | 28 | | (2) whether the substance of that training satisfies |
---|
23 | 29 | | the purpose of the course for which the student seeks credit as |
---|
24 | 30 | | described in the institution's course catalog. |
---|
25 | 31 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 132, Education Code, is |
---|
26 | 32 | | amended by adding Section 132.026 to read as follows: |
---|
27 | 33 | | Sec. 132.026. MEASURES TO FACILITATE AWARD OF COURSE CREDIT |
---|
28 | 34 | | FOR MILITARY SERVICE. (a) The commission shall evaluate programs |
---|
29 | 35 | | of study or courses offered by career schools or colleges leading to |
---|
30 | 36 | | industry-based certifications or other workforce credentials to |
---|
31 | 37 | | identify programs or courses for which skills obtained through |
---|
32 | 38 | | military experience, education, and training frequently align. |
---|
33 | 39 | | (b) The commission shall publish on its Internet website a |
---|
34 | 40 | | list of any programs of study or courses identified by the |
---|
35 | 41 | | commission under this section and the relevant military experience, |
---|
36 | 42 | | education, or training that may align with those programs or |
---|
37 | 43 | | courses. |
---|
38 | 44 | | SECTION 3. Section 132.055, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
39 | 45 | | adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
40 | 46 | | (c) In determining whether to approve a career school or |
---|
41 | 47 | | college that offers a program of study or course listed on the |
---|
42 | 48 | | commission's Internet website under Section 132.026(b), in |
---|
43 | 49 | | addition to the criteria prescribed by Subsection (b) of this |
---|
44 | 50 | | section, the commission shall require that the career school or |
---|
45 | 51 | | college provide credit to a student toward any course time required |
---|
46 | 52 | | for the program of study or course for skills obtained by the |
---|
47 | 53 | | student through military experience, education, or training, |
---|
48 | 54 | | unless the school or college can demonstrate that those skills are |
---|
49 | 55 | | not appropriately aligned with the program of study or course. |
---|
50 | | - | SECTION 4. Subchapter A, Chapter 434, Government Code, is |
---|
51 | | - | amended by adding Section 434.027 to read as follows: |
---|
52 | | - | Sec. 434.027. ENERGY INDUSTRY PROGRAM FOR VETERAN |
---|
53 | | - | PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (a) The Texas Veterans Commission shall |
---|
54 | | - | develop and administer a program to provide assistance to veterans |
---|
55 | | - | seeking a certification or training to prepare for employment in |
---|
56 | | - | the energy industry. |
---|
57 | | - | (b) The commission, in coordination with the General Land |
---|
58 | | - | Office and Veterans' Land Board, shall conduct an outreach campaign |
---|
59 | | - | to encourage veterans to participate in the program established |
---|
60 | | - | under this section. |
---|
61 | | - | (c) The commission shall adopt rules to implement the |
---|
62 | | - | program established under this section. |
---|
63 | | - | SECTION 5. Section 302.0031, Labor Code, is amended by |
---|
| 56 | + | SECTION 4. Section 302.0031, Labor Code, is amended by |
---|
64 | 57 | | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (i) to read as |
---|
65 | 58 | | follows: |
---|
66 | 59 | | (a) In this section: |
---|
67 | 60 | | (1) "Career school or college" has the meaning |
---|
68 | 61 | | assigned by Section 132.001, Education Code. |
---|
69 | 62 | | (2) "Institution[, "institution] of higher education" |
---|
70 | 63 | | has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code. |
---|
71 | 64 | | (i) Under the program, the commission shall identify, |
---|
72 | 65 | | develop, and support methods to facilitate the award of course time |
---|
73 | 66 | | credit by career schools or colleges or other private or nonprofit |
---|
74 | 67 | | entities providing programs of study or courses of instruction |
---|
75 | 68 | | leading to industry certifications or other workforce credentials |
---|
76 | 69 | | to veterans and military servicemembers for military experience, |
---|
77 | 70 | | education, or training obtained during military service for |
---|
78 | 71 | | programs of study or courses of instruction offered by those |
---|
79 | 72 | | schools, colleges, or other entities for which skills obtained |
---|
80 | 73 | | through military experience, education, and training align. |
---|
81 | | - | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
82 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
83 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
84 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 33 was passed by the House on April 1, |
---|
85 | | - | 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
86 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
87 | | - | No. 33 on May 12, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, 1 |
---|
88 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
89 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
91 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 33 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
92 | | - | amendments, on May 4, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. |
---|
93 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
94 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
95 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
96 | | - | Date |
---|
97 | | - | __________________ |
---|
98 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 74 | + | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
| 75 | + | * * * * * |
---|