Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB33 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note March 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021