Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021