Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021