Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2021
Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021