Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3402 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: VanDeaver (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3402
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 April 21, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the Franklin County Water
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4, Chapter 719, Acts of the 59th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1965, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 4.  DISTRICT POWERS. The District herein created shall
 have and possess and is hereby vested with all the rights, powers
 and privileges conferred by the General Laws of this State now in
 force and effect or hereafter enacted applicable to water control
 and improvement districts created under the authority of Article
 XVI, Section 59, of the Texas Constitution, but to the extent that
 said General Laws may be inconsistent or in conflict herewith, the
 provisions of this Act shall prevail. It is further the intention of
 the Legislature that the District herein created shall have all the
 power and authority necessary to fully qualify and gain the
 benefits of any and all laws which are in any wise helpful in
 carrying out the purposes for which the District is created and the
 provisions of all such laws of which the District may lawfully avail
 itself are hereby adopted by this reference and made applicable to
 the District.
 Without limiting the generality of the foregoing, the
 District shall and is hereby empowered to exercise the following
 powers, privileges and functions:
 (1)  To control, store, preserve and distribute its
 waters and flood waters, the waters of its rivers and streams, for
 all useful purposes and to accomplish these ends by all practicable
 means including the construction, maintenance and operation of all
 appropriate improvements, plants, works and facilities, the
 acquisition of water rights and all other properties, lands,
 tenements, easements and all other rights necessary to the purpose
 of the organization of the District.
 (2)  To process and store such waters and distribute
 same for municipal, domestic, irrigation and industrial purposes,
 subject to the requirements of Chapter 1, Title 128, Revised Civil
 Statutes of Texas, 1925, as amended.
 (3)  To dispose of property or rights therein when the
 same are no longer needed for the purposes for which the District is
 created or to lease same for purposes which will not interfere with
 the use of the property of the District.
 (4)  To cooperate with and contract with the State of
 Texas, the United States of America, or with any of their
 departments or agencies now existing, or which may hereafter be
 created, to carry out any of the powers or to further any of the
 purposes of the District and, for such purposes, to receive grants,
 loans or advancements therefrom.
 (5)  To make or cause to be made surveys and engineering
 investigations for the information of the District to facilitate
 the accomplishment of its purposes and to employ a general manager,
 attorneys, accountants, engineers, financial experts, or other
 technical or nontechnical employees or assistants; further to fix
 the amount and manner of their compensation and to provide for the
 payment of all expenditures deemed essential to the proper
 operation and maintenance of the District and its affairs.
 (6)  To exercise all functions to permit the
 accomplishment of its purposes including the acquisition within or
 without said District of land, easements, and rights-of-way and any
 other character of property incident to, or necessary in carrying
 out the purposes and work of the District by way of gift, device,
 purchase, leasehold or condemnation. The right of eminent domain is
 hereby expressly conferred on said District and the procedure with
 reference to condemnation, the assessment of and estimating of
 damages, payment, appeal, the entering upon the property pending
 appeal and other procedures prescribed in Title 52 of the Revised
 Civil Statutes of Texas, 1925, as heretofore or hereafter amended,
 shall apply to said District. In the event the District, in the
 exercise of the power of eminent domain or power of relocation, or
 any other power granted hereunder makes necessary the taking of any
 property or the relocation, raising, re-routing or changing the
 grade, or altering the construction of any highway, railroad,
 electric transmission line, telephone or telegraph properties and
 facilities, or pipeline, all such necessary taking, relocation,
 raising, re-routing, changing of grade or alteration of
 construction shall be accomplished at the expense of the District.
 It is provided, however, that the expense of the District shall be
 strictly confined to that amount which is equal to the actual cost
 of the property taken or work required without enhancement thereof
 and after deducting the net salvage value which may be derived from
 any property taken.
 (7)  To design, acquire, construct, improve, operate,
 maintain, and convey to this state, a county, or a municipality for
 operation and maintenance macadamized, graveled, or paved roads, or
 improvements, including storm drainage, in aid of those roads. The
 district may finance the road project with notes secured by non-tax
 revenue.  A road project must meet all applicable construction
 standards, zoning and subdivision requirements, and regulations of
 each municipality in whose corporate limits or extraterritorial
 jurisdiction the road project is located. If a road project is not
 located in the corporate limits or extraterritorial jurisdiction of
 a municipality, the road project must meet all applicable
 construction standards, subdivision requirements, and regulations
 of each county in which the road project is located. If the state
 will maintain and operate the road, the Texas Transportation
 Commission must approve the plans and specifications of the road
 project.
 (8)  To do any and all other acts or things necessary or
 proper to carry into effect the purpose for which the District is
 created and organized.
 SECTION 2.  The Franklin County Water District retains all
 rights, powers, privileges, authority, duties, and functions that
 it had before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *