Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3418 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021