Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3457 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: White (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 3457
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of certain laws to the Windham School
 District and teachers or administrators of the district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 19.009, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Sections 21.210 and 21.355 apply to the Windham School
 District and a teacher or administrator employed by the district in
 the same manner as those sections apply to any other school district
 and a teacher or administrator employed by those school districts.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *