Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3512 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021