Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021