1 | | - | H.B. No. 3516 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: King of Uvalde, Guillen H.B. No. 3516 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Perry) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
| 5 | + | Resources & Economic Development; May 10, 2021, rereferred to |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2021, |
---|
| 7 | + | reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 8 | + | May 19, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 9 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the regulation of the recycling of fluid oil and gas |
---|
6 | 15 | | waste. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 122.004, Natural Resources Code, is |
---|
9 | 18 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | Sec. 122.004. COMMISSION RULES FOR TREATMENT AND BENEFICIAL |
---|
11 | 20 | | USE. (a) The commission shall adopt rules to govern the treatment |
---|
12 | 21 | | and beneficial use of oil and gas waste. |
---|
13 | 22 | | (b) Rules adopted under this section must: |
---|
14 | 23 | | (1) encourage fluid oil and gas waste recycling for |
---|
15 | 24 | | beneficial purposes; and |
---|
16 | 25 | | (2) establish standards for the issuance of permits |
---|
17 | 26 | | for commercial recycling of fluid oil and gas waste. |
---|
18 | 27 | | (c) In adopting rules under this section, the commission |
---|
19 | 28 | | shall consider previously adopted rules for recycling fluid oil and |
---|
20 | 29 | | gas waste. |
---|
21 | 30 | | (d) Rules adopted under this section for commercial |
---|
22 | 31 | | recycling of fluid oil and gas waste must establish: |
---|
23 | 32 | | (1) minimum siting standards for fluid recycling pits; |
---|
24 | 33 | | (2) uniform technical, construction, and placement |
---|
25 | 34 | | standards; |
---|
26 | 35 | | (3) uniform standards for estimating closure costs; |
---|
27 | 36 | | (4) minimum and maximum bonding and financial security |
---|
28 | 37 | | amounts based on factors determined by the commission; and |
---|
29 | 38 | | (5) standards for sampling and analysis of fluid oil |
---|
30 | 39 | | and gas waste. |
---|
31 | 40 | | (e) The commission shall approve or deny an application for |
---|
32 | 41 | | a permit issued under rules adopted under this section not later |
---|
33 | 42 | | than the 90th day after the date the complete application was |
---|
34 | 43 | | received by the commission, unless a protest is filed with the |
---|
35 | 44 | | commission, in which case the commission may extend the amount of |
---|
36 | 45 | | time to approve or deny the application in order to allow for |
---|
37 | 46 | | notice, public comment, and a public hearing on the application. If |
---|
38 | 47 | | the commission does not approve or deny the application before that |
---|
39 | 48 | | date, the permit application is considered approved and the |
---|
40 | 49 | | applicant may operate under the terms specified in the application |
---|
41 | 50 | | for a period of one year. |
---|
42 | 51 | | (f) An application requesting a variance from the standards |
---|
43 | 52 | | adopted under this section must be evaluated and determined to be |
---|
44 | 53 | | substantially similar to previous variances approved by the |
---|
45 | 54 | | commission. |
---|
46 | 55 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
49 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3516 was passed by the House on April |
---|
50 | | - | 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 2, 1 present, not |
---|
51 | | - | voting. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
54 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3516 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
55 | | - | 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
58 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Date |
---|
60 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 56 | + | * * * * * |
---|