Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3522 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/19/2021

                            By: Hunter (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3522
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that certain persons taking oysters on
 a licensed commercial oyster boat obtain a commercial fisherman's
 license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 47.002(f), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  A person who takes or assists in taking oysters on a
 vessel licensed as a commercial oyster boat under Chapter 76 is
 [not] required to obtain or possess a general commercial
 fisherman's license unless the person holds a commercial oyster
 boat captain's license.
 SECTION 2.  Section 76.101(d), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Each member of the crew of a licensed commercial oyster
 boat is required to have a general commercial fisherman's license
 to take oysters while they are on a licensed boat that is being used
 to take oysters. This subsection does not apply to the captain of a
 licensed commercial oyster boat.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *