Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill May 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021