Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3616 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: A. Johnson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Johnson) H.B. No. 3616
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of massage therapy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 455.152, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 455.152.  INELIGIBILITY FOR LICENSE. A person is not
 eligible for a license as a massage establishment, massage school,
 massage therapist, or massage therapy instructor if the person is
 an individual and has been convicted of, entered a plea of nolo
 contendere or guilty to, or received deferred adjudication for:
 (1)  an offense under Chapter 20A, Penal Code, or
 Section 43.03, 43.031, 43.04, 43.041, or 43.05 [Subchapter A,
 Chapter 43], Penal Code; [,] or
 (2)  an offense under federal law or the laws of another
 state containing elements that are substantially similar to the
 elements of an offense described by Subdivision (1) [another sexual
 offense].
 SECTION 2.  Section 455.251, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 455.251.  GROUNDS FOR LICENSE DENIAL, [OR] DISCIPLINARY
 ACTION, OR ADMINISTRATIVE PENALTY. (a) The commission or
 executive director may refuse to issue a license to a person, [and
 shall] suspend, revoke, or refuse to renew the license of a person,
 or impose an administrative penalty under Subchapter F, Chapter 51,
 on [shall reprimand] a person licensed under this chapter if the
 person:
 (1)  obtains or attempts to obtain a license by fraud,
 misrepresentation, or concealment of material facts;
 (2)  sells, barters, or offers to sell or barter a
 license;
 (3)  violates a rule adopted by the commission under
 this chapter;
 (4)  engages in unprofessional conduct as defined by
 commission rule that endangers or is likely to endanger the health,
 welfare, or safety of the public;
 (5)  violates an order or ordinance adopted by a
 political subdivision under Chapter 243, Local Government Code; or
 (6)  violates this chapter.
 (b)  The commission or executive director shall revoke the
 license of a person licensed as a massage therapist or massage
 therapy instructor if:
 (1)  the person is convicted of, enters a plea of nolo
 contendere or guilty to, or receives deferred adjudication for:
 (A)  an offense under Chapter 20A, Penal Code, or
 Section 43.03, 43.031, 43.04, 43.041, or 43.05, Penal Code
 [involving prostitution or another sexual offense]; or
 (B)  an offense under federal law or the laws of
 another state containing elements that are substantially similar to
 the elements of an offense described by Paragraph (A); or
 (2)  the commission or executive director determines
 the person has practiced or administered massage therapy at or for a
 sexually oriented business.
 (c)  The commission or executive director:
 (1)  shall revoke the license of a person licensed as a
 massage school or massage establishment if the commission or
 executive director determines that[:
 [(1)]  the school or establishment is a sexually
 oriented business; and [or]
 (2)  may revoke the license of a person licensed as a
 massage school or massage establishment if the commission or
 executive director determines that any of the following offenses
 occurred on the premises of the school or establishment and [an
 offense involving prostitution or another sexual offense that]
 resulted in a conviction for the offense, a plea of nolo contendere
 or guilty to the offense, or a grant of deferred adjudication for
 the offense:
 (A)  an offense under Chapter 20A, Penal Code;
 (B)  an offense under Subchapter A, Chapter 43,
 Penal Code;
 (C)  an offense under federal law containing
 elements that are substantially similar to the elements of an
 offense described by Paragraph (A) or (B); or
 (D)  another sexual offense under the laws of this
 state [occurred on the premises of the school or establishment].
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
 adopt rules necessary to implement Sections 455.152 and 455.251,
 Occupations Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *