Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021