Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3630 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021