1 | | - | H.B. No. 3648 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Geren, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3648 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 14, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 14, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3648 By: Hancock |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the provision of natural gas and electric services in |
---|
6 | 14 | | this state. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 81, Natural Resources |
---|
9 | 17 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 81.073 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 81.073. CRITICAL NATURAL GAS FACILITIES AND ENTITIES. |
---|
11 | 19 | | (a) The commission shall collaborate with the Public Utility |
---|
12 | 20 | | Commission of Texas to adopt rules to establish a process to |
---|
13 | 21 | | designate certain natural gas facilities and entities associated |
---|
14 | 22 | | with providing natural gas in this state as critical customers or |
---|
15 | 23 | | critical gas suppliers during energy emergencies. |
---|
16 | 24 | | (b) The rules must: |
---|
17 | 25 | | (1) establish criteria for designating persons who own |
---|
18 | 26 | | or operate a facility under the jurisdiction of the commission |
---|
19 | 27 | | under Section 81.051(a) or engage in an activity under the |
---|
20 | 28 | | jurisdiction of the commission under Section 81.051(a) who must |
---|
21 | 29 | | provide critical customer and critical gas supply information, as |
---|
22 | 30 | | defined by the commission, to the entities described by Section |
---|
23 | 31 | | 38.074(b)(1), Utilities Code; and |
---|
24 | 32 | | (2) consider essential operational elements when |
---|
25 | 33 | | defining critical customer designations and critical gas supply |
---|
26 | 34 | | information for the purposes of Subdivision (1), including natural |
---|
27 | | - | gas production, processing, and transportation, related produced |
---|
28 | | - | water handling and disposal facilities, and the delivery of natural |
---|
29 | | - | gas to generators of electric energy. |
---|
30 | | - | SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 38, Utilities Code, is |
---|
| 35 | + | gas production, processing, transportation, and the delivery of |
---|
| 36 | + | natural gas to generators of electric energy. |
---|
| 37 | + | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 31, Utilities Code, is |
---|
| 38 | + | amended by adding Section 31.006 to read as follows: |
---|
| 39 | + | Sec. 31.006. LIMITED LIABILITY OF CERTAIN ELECTRIC |
---|
| 40 | + | UTILITIES. An electric utility that complies with an instruction, |
---|
| 41 | + | directive, order, regulation, or restriction regarding the |
---|
| 42 | + | operation of the electric utility's transmission or distribution |
---|
| 43 | + | system issued by an independent organization certified under |
---|
| 44 | + | Section 39.151 or a regulatory authority is not liable for any |
---|
| 45 | + | direct or consequential damages, including without limitation |
---|
| 46 | + | bodily or other personal injury, emotional injury, death, property |
---|
| 47 | + | damage, loss of profits, loss of revenue, or loss of production |
---|
| 48 | + | capacity, caused by the electric utility's compliance with the |
---|
| 49 | + | instruction, directive, order, regulation, or restriction. |
---|
| 50 | + | SECTION 3. Subchapter D, Chapter 38, Utilities Code, is |
---|
31 | 51 | | amended by adding Section 38.074 to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 52 | | Sec. 38.074. CRITICAL NATURAL GAS FACILITIES AND ENTITIES. |
---|
33 | 53 | | (a) The commission shall collaborate with the Railroad Commission |
---|
34 | 54 | | of Texas to adopt rules to establish a process to designate certain |
---|
35 | 55 | | natural gas facilities and entities associated with providing |
---|
36 | 56 | | natural gas in this state as critical during energy emergencies. |
---|
37 | 57 | | (b) The rules must: |
---|
38 | 58 | | (1) ensure that the independent organization |
---|
39 | 59 | | certified under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region and each |
---|
40 | 60 | | electric utility, municipally owned utility, and electric |
---|
41 | 61 | | cooperative providing service in the ERCOT power region is provided |
---|
42 | 62 | | with the information required by Section 81.073, Natural Resources |
---|
43 | 63 | | Code; |
---|
44 | 64 | | (2) provide for prioritizing for load-shed purposes |
---|
45 | 65 | | during an energy emergency the facilities and entities designated |
---|
46 | 66 | | under Subsection (a); and |
---|
47 | 67 | | (3) provide discretion to an electric utility, |
---|
48 | 68 | | municipally owned utility, or electric cooperative providing |
---|
49 | 69 | | service in the ERCOT power region to prioritize power delivery and |
---|
50 | 70 | | power restoration among the facilities and entities designated |
---|
51 | 71 | | under Subsection (a) on the utility's or cooperative's systems, as |
---|
52 | 72 | | circumstances require. |
---|
54 | 77 | | Railroad Commission of Texas shall adopt rules required by Section |
---|
55 | 78 | | 81.073, Natural Resources Code, and Section 38.074, Utilities Code, |
---|
56 | 79 | | as added by this Act, not later than December 1, 2021. |
---|
57 | 80 | | (b) The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall provide a |
---|
58 | 81 | | report to the legislature regarding the implementation by the |
---|
59 | 82 | | Public Utility Commission of Texas of the designation and |
---|
60 | 83 | | prioritization requirements in this Act not later than January 1, |
---|
61 | 84 | | 2022. |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
69 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3648 was passed by the House on April |
---|
70 | | - | 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
71 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
72 | | - | H.B. No. 3648 on May 24, 2021, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
73 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
74 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
75 | | - | on H.B. No. 3648 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 141, |
---|
76 | | - | Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
77 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
79 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3648 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
80 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
81 | | - | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
82 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
83 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
84 | | - | 3648 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
85 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
87 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
88 | | - | Date |
---|
89 | | - | __________________ |
---|
90 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 90 | + | * * * * * |
---|