Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3648 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 3648


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of natural gas and electric services in
 this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 81, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 81.073 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.073.  CRITICAL NATURAL GAS FACILITIES AND ENTITIES.
 (a) The commission shall collaborate with the Public Utility
 Commission of Texas to adopt rules to establish a process to
 designate certain natural gas facilities and entities associated
 with providing natural gas in this state as critical customers or
 critical gas suppliers during energy emergencies.
 (b)  The rules must:
 (1)  establish criteria for designating persons who own
 or operate a facility under the jurisdiction of the commission
 under Section 81.051(a) or engage in an activity under the
 jurisdiction of the commission under Section 81.051(a) who must
 provide critical customer and critical gas supply information, as
 defined by the commission, to the entities described by Section
 38.074(b)(1), Utilities Code; and
 (2)  consider essential operational elements when
 defining critical customer designations and critical gas supply
 information for the purposes of Subdivision (1), including natural
 gas production, processing, and transportation, related produced
 water handling and disposal facilities, and the delivery of natural
 gas to generators of electric energy.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 38, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.074 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.074.  CRITICAL NATURAL GAS FACILITIES AND ENTITIES.
 (a) The commission shall collaborate with the Railroad Commission
 of Texas to adopt rules to establish a process to designate certain
 natural gas facilities and entities associated with providing
 natural gas in this state as critical during energy emergencies.
 (b)  The rules must:
 (1)  ensure that the independent organization
 certified under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region and each
 electric utility, municipally owned utility, and electric
 cooperative providing service in the ERCOT power region is provided
 with the information required by Section 81.073, Natural Resources
 Code;
 (2)  provide for prioritizing for load-shed purposes
 during an energy emergency the facilities and entities designated
 under Subsection (a); and
 (3)  provide discretion to an electric utility,
 municipally owned utility, or electric cooperative providing
 service in the ERCOT power region to prioritize power delivery and
 power restoration among the facilities and entities designated
 under Subsection (a) on the utility's or cooperative's systems, as
 circumstances require.
 SECTION 3.  (a) The Public Utility Commission of Texas and
 Railroad Commission of Texas shall adopt rules required by Section
 81.073, Natural Resources Code, and Section 38.074, Utilities Code,
 as added by this Act, not later than December 1, 2021.
 (b)  The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall provide a
 report to the legislature regarding the implementation by the
 Public Utility Commission of Texas of the designation and
 prioritization requirements in this Act not later than January 1,
 2022.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3648 was passed by the House on April
 20, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3648 on May 24, 2021, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3648 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 141,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3648 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3648 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor