Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB368 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021