Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3690 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021