Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3712 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3712
1+By: Thompson of Brazoria, et al. H.B. No. 3712
2+ (Senate Sponsor - West)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
4+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Jurisprudence; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
7+ May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3712 By: Huffman
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the training of and policies for peace officers.
615 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
716 SECTION 1. The heading to Subchapter F, Chapter 1701,
817 Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows:
918 SUBCHAPTER F. TRAINING PROGRAMS, [AND] SCHOOLS, AND POLICIES
1019 SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
1120 amended by adding Section 1701.2551 to read as follows:
1221 Sec. 1701.2551. BASIC PEACE OFFICER TRAINING COURSE. (a)
1322 The basic peace officer training course required as part of a peace
1423 officer training program under Section 1701.251(a) may be no less
1524 than 720 hours.
1625 (b) The basic peace officer training course must include
1726 training on:
1827 (1) the prohibition against the intentional use of a
1928 choke hold, carotid artery hold, or similar neck restraint by a
2029 peace officer in searching or arresting a person, unless the
2130 officer reasonably believes the restraint is necessary to prevent
2231 serious bodily injury to or the death of the peace officer or
2332 another person;
2433 (2) the duty of a peace officer to intervene to stop or
2534 prevent another peace officer from using force against a person
2635 suspected of committing an offense if:
2736 (A) the amount of force exceeds that which is
2837 reasonable under the circumstances; and
2938 (B) the officer knows or should know that the
3039 other officer's use of force:
3140 (i) violates state or federal law;
3241 (ii) puts a person at risk of bodily injury,
3342 as that term is defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, and is not
3443 immediately necessary to avoid imminent bodily injury to a peace
3544 officer or other person; and
3645 (iii) is not required to apprehend the
3746 person suspected of committing an offense; and
3847 (3) the duty of a peace officer who encounters an
3948 injured person while discharging the officer's official duties to
4049 immediately and as necessary request emergency medical services
4150 personnel to provide the person with emergency medical services
4251 and, while waiting for emergency medical services personnel to
4352 arrive, provide first aid or treatment to the person to the extent
4453 of the officer's skills and training, unless the request for
4554 emergency medical services personnel or the provision of first aid
4655 or treatment would expose the officer or another person to a risk of
4756 bodily injury or the officer is injured and physically unable to
4857 make the request or provide the treatment.
4958 SECTION 3. Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
5059 amended by adding Sections 1701.269 and 1701.270 to read as
5160 follows:
5261 Sec. 1701.269. TRAINING PROGRAM AND POLICIES FOR PEACE
5362 OFFICERS. (a) The commission, in consultation with the Bill
5463 Blackwood Law Enforcement Management Institute of Texas and other
5564 interested parties chosen by the commission, shall develop and
5665 maintain a model training curriculum and model policies for law
5766 enforcement agencies and peace officers.
5867 (b) The model training curriculum and model policies
5968 developed under Subsection (a) must include:
6069 (1) curriculum and policies for banning the use of a
6170 choke hold, carotid artery hold, or similar neck restraint by a
6271 peace officer in searching or arresting a person, unless the
6372 officer reasonably believes the restraint is necessary to prevent
6473 serious bodily injury to or the death of the peace officer or
6574 another person;
6675 (2) curriculum and policies regarding the duty of a
6776 peace officer to intervene to stop or prevent another peace officer
6877 from using force against a person suspected of committing an
6978 offense if:
7079 (A) the amount of force exceeds that which is
7180 reasonable under the circumstances; and
7281 (B) the officer knows or should know that the
7382 other officer's use of force:
7483 (i) violates state or federal law;
7584 (ii) puts a person at risk of bodily injury,
7685 as that term is defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, and is not
7786 immediately necessary to avoid imminent bodily injury to a peace
7887 officer or other person; and
7988 (iii) is not required to apprehend the
8089 person suspected of committing an offense; and
8190 (3) curriculum and policies regarding the duty of a
8291 peace officer who encounters an injured person while discharging
8392 the officer's official duties to immediately and as necessary
8493 request emergency medical services personnel to provide the person
8594 with emergency medical services and, while waiting for emergency
8695 medical services personnel to arrive, provide first aid or
8796 treatment to the person to the extent of the officer's skills and
8897 training, unless the request for emergency medical services
8998 personnel or the provision of first aid or treatment would expose
9099 the officer or another person to a risk of bodily injury or the
91100 officer is injured and physically unable to make the request or
92101 provide the treatment.
93102 Sec. 1701.270. REQUIRED POLICIES FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT
94103 AGENCIES. Not later than the 180th day after the date the
95104 commission provides the model policies described by Section
96105 1701.269(b), each law enforcement agency in this state shall adopt
97106 a policy on the topics described by that subsection. A law
98107 enforcement agency may adopt the model policies developed by the
99108 commission under that subsection.
100109 SECTION 4. Section 1701.351, Occupations Code, is amended
101110 by adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
102111 (a-2) Before the first day of each 24-month training unit
103112 during which peace officers are required to complete 40 hours of
104113 continuing education programs under Subsection (a), the commission
105114 shall specify the mandated topics to be covered in up to 16 of the
106115 required hours.
107116 SECTION 5. (a) Not later than January 1, 2022, the Texas
108117 Commission on Law Enforcement shall modify the curriculum of the
109118 basic peace officer training course as necessary to comply with
110119 Section 1701.2551, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
111120 (b) The minimum hour and content requirements for the basic
112121 peace officer training course under Section 1701.2551, Occupations
113122 Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a person who first begins
114123 the course on or after July 1, 2022.
115124 SECTION 6. Not later than January 1, 2022, the Texas
116125 Commission on Law Enforcement shall develop and make available the
117126 model training curriculum and model policies required by Section
118127 1701.269, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
119128 SECTION 7. Section 1701.351(a-2), Occupations Code, as
120129 added by this Act, applies only to a training unit that begins on or
121130 after the effective date of this Act.
122131 SECTION 8. The Texas Commission on Law Enforcement is
123132 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
124133 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
125134 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
126135 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
127136 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
128137 purpose.
129138 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
130- ______________________________ ______________________________
131- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
132- I certify that H.B. No. 3712 was passed by the House on April
133- 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 5, 1 present, not
134- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
135- No. 3712 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0,
136- 1 present, not voting.
137- ______________________________
138- Chief Clerk of the House
139- I certify that H.B. No. 3712 was passed by the Senate, with
140- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
141- 0.
142- ______________________________
143- Secretary of the Senate
144- APPROVED: __________________
145- Date
146- __________________
147- Governor
139+ * * * * *