Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3712 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 3712


 AN ACT
 relating to the training of and policies for peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter F, Chapter 1701,
 Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER F. TRAINING PROGRAMS, [AND] SCHOOLS, AND POLICIES
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.2551 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.2551.  BASIC PEACE OFFICER TRAINING COURSE. (a)
 The basic peace officer training course required as part of a peace
 officer training program under Section 1701.251(a) may be no less
 than 720 hours.
 (b)  The basic peace officer training course must include
 training on:
 (1)  the prohibition against the intentional use of a
 choke hold, carotid artery hold, or similar neck restraint by a
 peace officer in searching or arresting a person, unless the
 officer reasonably believes the restraint is necessary to prevent
 serious bodily injury to or the death of the peace officer or
 another person;
 (2)  the duty of a peace officer to intervene to stop or
 prevent another peace officer from using force against a person
 suspected of committing an offense if:
 (A)  the amount of force exceeds that which is
 reasonable under the circumstances; and
 (B)  the officer knows or should know that the
 other officer's use of force:
 (i)  violates state or federal law;
 (ii)  puts a person at risk of bodily injury,
 as that term is defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, and is not
 immediately necessary to avoid imminent bodily injury to a peace
 officer or other person; and
 (iii)  is not required to apprehend the
 person suspected of committing an offense; and
 (3)  the duty of a peace officer who encounters an
 injured person while discharging the officer's official duties to
 immediately and as necessary request emergency medical services
 personnel to provide the person with emergency medical services
 and, while waiting for emergency medical services personnel to
 arrive, provide first aid or treatment to the person to the extent
 of the officer's skills and training, unless the request for
 emergency medical services personnel or the provision of first aid
 or treatment would expose the officer or another person to a risk of
 bodily injury or the officer is injured and physically unable to
 make the request or provide the treatment.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 1701.269 and 1701.270 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1701.269.  TRAINING PROGRAM AND POLICIES FOR PEACE
 OFFICERS. (a) The commission, in consultation with the Bill
 Blackwood Law Enforcement Management Institute of Texas and other
 interested parties chosen by the commission, shall develop and
 maintain a model training curriculum and model policies for law
 enforcement agencies and peace officers.
 (b)  The model training curriculum and model policies
 developed under Subsection (a) must include:
 (1)  curriculum and policies for banning the use of a
 choke hold, carotid artery hold, or similar neck restraint by a
 peace officer in searching or arresting a person, unless the
 officer reasonably believes the restraint is necessary to prevent
 serious bodily injury to or the death of the peace officer or
 another person;
 (2)  curriculum and policies regarding the duty of a
 peace officer to intervene to stop or prevent another peace officer
 from using force against a person suspected of committing an
 offense if:
 (A)  the amount of force exceeds that which is
 reasonable under the circumstances; and
 (B)  the officer knows or should know that the
 other officer's use of force:
 (i)  violates state or federal law;
 (ii)  puts a person at risk of bodily injury,
 as that term is defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, and is not
 immediately necessary to avoid imminent bodily injury to a peace
 officer or other person; and
 (iii)  is not required to apprehend the
 person suspected of committing an offense; and
 (3)  curriculum and policies regarding the duty of a
 peace officer who encounters an injured person while discharging
 the officer's official duties to immediately and as necessary
 request emergency medical services personnel to provide the person
 with emergency medical services and, while waiting for emergency
 medical services personnel to arrive, provide first aid or
 treatment to the person to the extent of the officer's skills and
 training, unless the request for emergency medical services
 personnel or the provision of first aid or treatment would expose
 the officer or another person to a risk of bodily injury or the
 officer is injured and physically unable to make the request or
 provide the treatment.
 Sec. 1701.270.  REQUIRED POLICIES FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT
 AGENCIES. Not later than the 180th day after the date the
 commission provides the model policies described by Section
 1701.269(b), each law enforcement agency in this state shall adopt
 a policy on the topics described by that subsection. A law
 enforcement agency may adopt the model policies developed by the
 commission under that subsection.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1701.351, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  Before the first day of each 24-month training unit
 during which peace officers are required to complete 40 hours of
 continuing education programs under Subsection (a), the commission
 shall specify the mandated topics to be covered in up to 16 of the
 required hours.
 SECTION 5.  (a) Not later than January 1, 2022, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall modify the curriculum of the
 basic peace officer training course as necessary to comply with
 Section 1701.2551, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The minimum hour and content requirements for the basic
 peace officer training course under Section 1701.2551, Occupations
 Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a person who first begins
 the course on or after July 1, 2022.
 SECTION 6.  Not later than January 1, 2022, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall develop and make available the
 model training curriculum and model policies required by Section
 1701.269, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 7.  Section 1701.351(a-2), Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a training unit that begins on or
 after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 8.  The Texas Commission on Law Enforcement is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3712 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 123, Nays 5, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3712 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3712 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor