Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3717 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Burns (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3717
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale of a water or sewer utility system by a
 municipality without an election.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1502.055, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a) or other law, a
 municipality is not required to hold an election to authorize the
 sale of a municipal retail water or sewer utility system if the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has issued a notice of
 violation to the utility system and the governing body of the
 municipality finds by official action that the municipality is
 either financially or technically unable to restore the system to
 compliance with the applicable law or regulations.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *