Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3717 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021