Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3721 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021