Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3721 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3721
1+By: Ellzey, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3721
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
3+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the inclusion of information for reporting suspicious
612 activity to the Department of Public Safety on certain human
713 trafficking signs or notices.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. Section 104.07, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
1016 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
1117 (a-1) In addition to the notice required under Subsection
1218 (a), the sign must include the contact information for reporting
1319 suspicious activity to the Department of Public Safety.
1420 SECTION 2. Section 102.101(b), Business & Commerce Code, is
1521 amended to read as follows:
1622 (b) The attorney general by rule shall prescribe the design,
1723 content, and manner of display of the sign required by this
1824 section. The sign must:
1925 (1) be in both English and Spanish; [and]
2026 (2) include the telephone number and Internet website
2127 of the National Human Trafficking Resource Center; and
2228 (3) include the contact information for reporting
2329 suspicious activity to the Department of Public Safety.
2430 SECTION 3. Section 125.002(f-1), Civil Practice and
2531 Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
2632 (f-1) If the defendant required to execute the bond is a
2733 hotel, motel, or similar establishment that rents overnight lodging
2834 to the public and the alleged common nuisance is under Section
2935 125.0015(a)(6) or (7), the bond must also be conditioned that the
3036 defendant will, in each of the defendant's lodging units on the
3137 premises that are the subject of the suit, post in a conspicuous
3238 place near the room rate information required to be posted under
3339 Section 2155.001, Occupations Code, a sign that includes:
3440 (1) an operating toll-free telephone number of a
3541 nationally recognized information and referral hotline for victims
3642 of human trafficking; and
3743 (2) the contact information for reporting suspicious
3844 activity to the Department of Public Safety.
3945 SECTION 4. Section 402.0351(b), Government Code, is amended
4046 to read as follows:
4147 (b) The attorney general by rule shall prescribe the design
4248 and content of a sign regarding services and assistance available
4349 to victims of human trafficking to be displayed at transportation
4450 hubs. The sign must be in both English and Spanish and include:
4551 (1) the telephone number and Internet website of the
4652 National Human Trafficking Resource Center; [and]
4753 (2) the contact information for reporting suspicious
4854 activity to the Department of Public Safety; and
4955 (3) the key indicators that a person is a victim of
5056 human trafficking.
5157 SECTION 5. Section 245.025, Health and Safety Code, is
5258 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
5359 (a-1) In addition to the information required under
5460 Subsection (a), the sign must include the contact information for
5561 reporting suspicious activity to the Department of Public Safety.
5662 SECTION 6. Section 455.207(b), Occupations Code, is amended
5763 to read as follows:
5864 (b) The sign required by this section must:
5965 (1) be in English, Spanish, Korean, Mandarin, and any
6066 other language required by commission rule;
6167 (2) include a toll-free telephone number of a
6268 nationally recognized information and referral hotline for victims
6369 of human trafficking; [and]
6470 (3) include the contact information for reporting
6571 suspicious activity to the Department of Public Safety; and
6672 (4) be displayed in a conspicuous place clearly
6773 visible to the public.
6874 SECTION 7. Section 1602.408(c), Occupations Code, is
6975 amended to read as follows:
7076 (c) The sign required by this section must be in English,
7177 Spanish, and Vietnamese and include:
7278 (1) a toll-free telephone number of a nationally
7379 recognized information and referral hotline for victims of human
7480 trafficking; and
7581 (2) the contact information for reporting suspicious
7682 activity to the Department of Public Safety.
7783 SECTION 8. Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
7884 Alcoholic Beverage Commission shall, in collaboration with the
7985 Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, develop guidance
8086 for compliance with and notify affected license and permit holders
8187 of the change in law made by this Act to Section 104.07, Alcoholic
8288 Beverage Code.
8389 SECTION 9. (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the
8490 attorney general shall, in collaboration with the Department of
8591 Public Safety of the State of Texas, adopt the rules necessary to
8692 implement the changes in law made by this Act to Section 102.101,
8793 Business & Commerce Code, and Section 402.0351, Government Code.
8894 (b) Not later than January 1, 2022:
8995 (1) a sexually oriented business shall comply with
9096 Section 102.101, Business & Commerce Code, as amended by this Act;
9197 and
9298 (2) a transportation hub shall comply with Section
9399 402.0351, Government Code, as amended by this Act.
94100 SECTION 10. The change in law made by this Act to Section
95101 125.002, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, applies only to a suit
96102 filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A suit filed
97103 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
98104 effect immediately before that date, and that law is continued in
99105 effect for that purpose.
100106 SECTION 11. (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the
101107 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
102108 shall, in collaboration with the Department of Public Safety of the
103109 State of Texas, adopt the rules necessary to implement the change in
104110 law made by this Act to Section 245.025, Health and Safety Code.
105111 (b) Not later than January 1, 2022, a hospital or abortion
106112 facility shall comply with Section 245.025, Health and Safety Code,
107113 as amended by this Act.
108114 SECTION 12. (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
109115 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall, in collaboration with
110116 the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, adopt the
111117 rules necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act to
112118 Sections 455.207 and 1602.408, Occupations Code.
113119 (b) Not later than January 1, 2022:
114120 (1) a massage establishment or massage school shall
115121 comply with Section 455.207, Occupations Code, as amended by this
116122 Act; and
117123 (2) a licensed facility as defined by Section
118124 1602.408(a), Occupations Code, shall comply with Section 1602.408,
119125 Occupations Code, as amended by this Act.
120126 SECTION 13. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
121- ______________________________ ______________________________
122- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
123- I certify that H.B. No. 3721 was passed by the House on April
124- 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not
125- voting.
126- ______________________________
127- Chief Clerk of the House
128- I certify that H.B. No. 3721 was passed by the Senate on May
129- 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
130- ______________________________
131- Secretary of the Senate
132- APPROVED: _____________________
133- Date
134- _____________________
135- Governor
127+ * * * * *