Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3752 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3752
1+By: Frank, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3752
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
3+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
4+ Commerce; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3752 By: Hancock
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the offering of health benefit coverage by subsidiaries
614 of the Texas Mutual Insurance Company.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Section 2054.107, Insurance Code, is amended to
917 read as follows:
1018 Sec. 2054.107. CERTAIN RELATIONSHIPS WITH OTHER INSURERS
1119 PROHIBITED. Except as provided by Section 2054.602, the [The]
1220 company may not have:
1321 (1) an affiliate, spin-off, or subsidiary that writes
1422 a line of insurance other than workers' compensation insurance; or
1523 (2) interlocking boards of directors with an insurer
1624 that writes a line of insurance other than workers' compensation
1725 insurance.
1826 SECTION 2. Chapter 2054, Insurance Code, is amended by
1927 adding Subchapter M to read as follows:
2028 SUBCHAPTER M. SUBSIDIARIES AUTHORIZED TO PROVIDE HEALTH BENEFIT
2129 COVERAGE
2230 Sec. 2054.601. DEFINITION. In this subchapter,
2331 "alternative health benefit coverage" means health benefit
2432 coverage:
2533 (1) provided by a subsidiary of the company that is not
2634 authorized to engage in the business of insurance in this state;
2735 (2) offered only to:
2836 (A) individuals;
2937 (B) small businesses with not more than 250
3038 full-time equivalent employees; or
3139 (C) the company's policyholders or their
3240 employees; and
3341 (3) that is not:
3442 (A) provided through an insurance policy or other
3543 product the offering or issuance of which constitutes the business
3644 of insurance in this state; or
3745 (B) benefit coverage subject to the laws
3846 governing workers' compensation in this state.
3947 Sec. 2054.602. HEALTH BENEFIT COVERAGE OFFERED BY
4048 SUBSIDIARY AUTHORIZED. (a) The company may create, acquire, or
4149 otherwise own or operate one or more subsidiaries that offer
4250 accident or health insurance or another type of health benefit
4351 coverage or health benefit plan as provided by this subchapter.
4452 (b) A subsidiary of the company may offer in this state:
4553 (1) accident or health insurance or another type of
4654 health benefit plan authorized under this code, in accordance with
4755 a certificate of authority issued to the subsidiary under this
4856 code; or
4957 (2) alternative health benefit coverage as described
5058 by Section 2054.601.
5159 (c) A subsidiary of the company may not offer or issue an
5260 occupational policy for an employer or an employer's employees
5361 covering an occupational bodily injury, disease, or death that
5462 explicitly provides liability coverage to an employer that elects
5563 not to maintain workers' compensation insurance coverage under
5664 Chapter 406, Labor Code.
5765 (d) A subsidiary of the company may not offer or issue any
5866 policy, plan, or benefit coverage under this section before
5967 September 1, 2023. This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
6068 Sec. 2054.603. CONSIDERATIONS AND GUIDING PRINCIPLES FOR
6169 DEVELOPING HEALTH BENEFIT COVERAGE OFFERINGS. (a) In developing
6270 health benefit coverage or health benefit plan options to be
6371 offered through a subsidiary of the company, the company shall
6472 fully explore all health coverage options that may be offered under
6573 this subchapter and place emphasis on:
6674 (1) increasing competition in the health insurance
6775 market;
6876 (2) utilizing innovations that improve the quality of
6977 health care while lowering health care costs;
7078 (3) ensuring adequacy of benefits and access to care
7179 for individuals in this state with preexisting conditions;
7280 (4) issuing coverage in a manner that does not
7381 discriminate against individuals with preexisting conditions;
7482 (5) leveraging federal tax credits that may be
7583 available for private health benefit plans to the greatest extent
7684 possible to increase the affordability of health benefit plans;
7785 (6) ensuring transparency and coherence of costs and
7886 coverage to inform individuals shopping for health benefits;
7987 (7) reducing incidences of medical debt faced by
8088 individuals in this state and uncompensated care faced by providers
8189 in this state; and
8290 (8) ensuring equitable costs regardless of gender or
8391 prospects of pregnancy or childbirth.
8492 (b) Not later than September 1, 2022, the company shall
8593 submit to the legislature a report explaining how any anticipated
8694 health benefit coverage offerings would comply with all
8795 considerations and guiding principles for developing health
8896 benefit coverage offerings under Subsection (a). This subsection
8997 expires January 1, 2023.
9098 Sec. 2054.604. RULES. Except with respect to alternative
9199 health benefit coverage as described by Section 2054.601 or a
92100 subsidiary of the company offering alternative health benefit
93101 coverage, the commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
94102 implement this subchapter.
95103 Sec. 2054.605. EXEMPTION FROM OTHER INSURANCE LAWS. A
96104 provision of this code, other than this chapter, does not apply to
97105 alternative health benefit coverage as described by Section
98106 2054.601 unless alternative health benefit coverage is expressly
99107 mentioned in the other law.
100108 Sec. 2054.606. SUBSIDIARY NOT ENGAGED IN BUSINESS OF
101109 INSURANCE. Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, for
102110 the purposes of offering alternative health benefit coverage as
103111 described by Section 2054.601, a subsidiary of the company that
104112 acts in accordance with this subchapter is not an insurer and is not
105113 engaging in the business of insurance in this state.
106114 Sec. 2054.607. RISK TRANSFER OR COVERAGE. A subsidiary of
107115 the company that offers health benefit coverage under this
108116 subchapter may contract with an outside company authorized to
109117 engage in the business of insurance in this state that is not under
110118 common control with the company or the subsidiary to:
111119 (1) transfer to the outside company all or a portion of
112120 the subsidiary's risks arising from health benefit coverage offered
113121 under this subchapter; or
114122 (2) obtain insurance coverage from the outside company
115123 guarantying the subsidiary's obligations arising from health
116124 benefit coverage offered under this subchapter.
125+ Sec. 2054.608. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
126+ expires August 31, 2023.
117127 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
118- ______________________________ ______________________________
119- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
120- I certify that H.B. No. 3752 was passed by the House on May 5,
121- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 100, Nays 46, 1 present, not
122- voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
123- H.B. No. 3752 on May 28, 2021, and requested the appointment of a
124- conference committee to consider the differences between the two
125- houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
126- on H.B. No. 3752 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 89,
127- Nays 53, 2 present, not voting.
128- ______________________________
129- Chief Clerk of the House
130- I certify that H.B. No. 3752 was passed by the Senate, with
131- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
132- 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
133- committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
134- that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
135- 3752 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
136- ______________________________
137- Secretary of the Senate
138- APPROVED: __________________
139- Date
140- __________________
141- Governor
128+ * * * * *