Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3752 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 3752


 AN ACT
 relating to the offering of health benefit coverage by subsidiaries
 of the Texas Mutual Insurance Company.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2054.107, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.107.  CERTAIN RELATIONSHIPS WITH OTHER INSURERS
 PROHIBITED. Except as provided by Section 2054.602, the [The]
 company may not have:
 (1)  an affiliate, spin-off, or subsidiary that writes
 a line of insurance other than workers' compensation insurance; or
 (2)  interlocking boards of directors with an insurer
 that writes a line of insurance other than workers' compensation
 insurance.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 2054, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter M to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER M. SUBSIDIARIES AUTHORIZED TO PROVIDE HEALTH BENEFIT
 COVERAGE
 Sec. 2054.601.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter,
 "alternative health benefit coverage" means health benefit
 coverage:
 (1)  provided by a subsidiary of the company that is not
 authorized to engage in the business of insurance in this state;
 (2)  offered only to:
 (A)  individuals;
 (B)  small businesses with not more than 250
 full-time equivalent employees; or
 (C)  the company's policyholders or their
 employees; and
 (3)  that is not:
 (A)  provided through an insurance policy or other
 product the offering or issuance of which constitutes the business
 of insurance in this state; or
 (B)  benefit coverage subject to the laws
 governing workers' compensation in this state.
 Sec. 2054.602.  HEALTH BENEFIT COVERAGE OFFERED BY
 SUBSIDIARY AUTHORIZED. (a) The company may create, acquire, or
 otherwise own or operate one or more subsidiaries that offer
 accident or health insurance or another type of health benefit
 coverage or health benefit plan as provided by this subchapter.
 (b)  A subsidiary of the company may offer in this state:
 (1)  accident or health insurance or another type of
 health benefit plan authorized under this code, in accordance with
 a certificate of authority issued to the subsidiary under this
 code; or
 (2)  alternative health benefit coverage as described
 by Section 2054.601.
 (c)  A subsidiary of the company may not offer or issue an
 occupational policy for an employer or an employer's employees
 covering an occupational bodily injury, disease, or death that
 explicitly provides liability coverage to an employer that elects
 not to maintain workers' compensation insurance coverage under
 Chapter 406, Labor Code.
 (d)  A subsidiary of the company may not offer or issue any
 policy, plan, or benefit coverage under this section before
 September 1, 2023.  This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
 Sec. 2054.603.  CONSIDERATIONS AND GUIDING PRINCIPLES FOR
 DEVELOPING HEALTH BENEFIT COVERAGE OFFERINGS. (a)  In developing
 health benefit coverage or health benefit plan options to be
 offered through a subsidiary of the company, the company shall
 fully explore all health coverage options that may be offered under
 this subchapter and place emphasis on:
 (1)  increasing competition in the health insurance
 market;
 (2)  utilizing innovations that improve the quality of
 health care while lowering health care costs;
 (3)  ensuring adequacy of benefits and access to care
 for individuals in this state with preexisting conditions;
 (4)  issuing coverage in a manner that does not
 discriminate against individuals with preexisting conditions;
 (5)  leveraging federal tax credits that may be
 available for private health benefit plans to the greatest extent
 possible to increase the affordability of health benefit plans;
 (6)  ensuring transparency and coherence of costs and
 coverage to inform individuals shopping for health benefits;
 (7)  reducing incidences of medical debt faced by
 individuals in this state and uncompensated care faced by providers
 in this state; and
 (8)  ensuring equitable costs regardless of gender or
 prospects of pregnancy or childbirth.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the company shall
 submit to the legislature a report explaining how any anticipated
 health benefit coverage offerings would comply with all
 considerations and guiding principles for developing health
 benefit coverage offerings under Subsection (a).  This subsection
 expires January 1, 2023.
 Sec. 2054.604.  RULES. Except with respect to alternative
 health benefit coverage as described by Section 2054.601 or a
 subsidiary of the company offering alternative health benefit
 coverage, the commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this subchapter.
 Sec. 2054.605.  EXEMPTION FROM OTHER INSURANCE LAWS. A
 provision of this code, other than this chapter, does not apply to
 alternative health benefit coverage as described by Section
 2054.601 unless alternative health benefit coverage is expressly
 mentioned in the other law.
 Sec. 2054.606.  SUBSIDIARY NOT ENGAGED IN BUSINESS OF
 INSURANCE. Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, for
 the purposes of offering alternative health benefit coverage as
 described by Section 2054.601, a subsidiary of the company that
 acts in accordance with this subchapter is not an insurer and is not
 engaging in the business of insurance in this state.
 Sec. 2054.607.  RISK TRANSFER OR COVERAGE. A subsidiary of
 the company that offers health benefit coverage under this
 subchapter may contract with an outside company authorized to
 engage in the business of insurance in this state that is not under
 common control with the company or the subsidiary to:
 (1)  transfer to the outside company all or a portion of
 the subsidiary's risks arising from health benefit coverage offered
 under this subchapter; or
 (2)  obtain insurance coverage from the outside company
 guarantying the subsidiary's obligations arising from health
 benefit coverage offered under this subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3752 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 100, Nays 46, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3752 on May 28, 2021, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3752 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 89,
 Nays 53, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3752 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3752 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor