Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3773 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Lopez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3773
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating September 21 as Alzheimer's Awareness Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.083 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.083.  ALZHEIMER'S AWARENESS DAY. (a) September 21
 is Alzheimer's Awareness Day to increase awareness of individuals
 who are suffering from dementia and to express appreciation to the
 caregivers of Alzheimer's patients for the services and care
 provided to the patients.
 (b)  Alzheimer's Awareness Day shall be regularly observed
 by appropriate programs and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *