Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3800 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021