1 | | - | H.B. No. 3800 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 3800 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the release of a reversionary interest in certain real |
---|
6 | 12 | | property by the Health and Human Services Commission and conditions |
---|
7 | 13 | | related to that release. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 1(a), Chapter 54 (H.B. 2641), Acts of the |
---|
10 | 16 | | 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, is amended to read as |
---|
11 | 17 | | follows: |
---|
12 | 18 | | (a) Subject to Subsections (b) and (c) of this section and |
---|
13 | 19 | | not later than February 1, 2023 [2021], the Health and Human |
---|
14 | 20 | | Services Commission shall execute an appropriate instrument to |
---|
15 | 21 | | release and nullify the right of reverter to which the real property |
---|
16 | 22 | | described by Section 2 of this Act is subject under the deed filed |
---|
17 | 23 | | in the Deed Records of Howard County, Texas, at Volume 795, Pages |
---|
18 | 24 | | 141-143. |
---|
19 | 25 | | SECTION 2. Section 3, Chapter 54 (H.B. 2641), Acts of the |
---|
20 | 26 | | 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, is amended to read as |
---|
21 | 27 | | follows: |
---|
22 | 28 | | SECTION 3. The real property title to which is held by Cap |
---|
23 | 29 | | Rock Holdings, LLC, a Texas limited liability company, is situated |
---|
24 | 30 | | in Howard County, Texas, and more particularly described as |
---|
25 | 31 | | follows: |
---|
26 | 32 | | ALL BK 75, ORIGINAL TOWN ADDN., CITY OF BIG SPRING, HOWARD COUNTY, |
---|
27 | 33 | | TEXAS |
---|
28 | 34 | | [400 Nolan, Big Spring, TX |
---|
29 | 35 | | Acres 0.257, LT 1 & N/30 of LT 2 BK 31 Original Town 80X140 0535 ACQ |
---|
30 | 36 | | 062211 BLK/TRACT 31 0.257 acres |
---|
31 | 37 | | 401 Johnson (7-11) Big Spring, TX |
---|
32 | 38 | | Acre 0.321, Lts 11-12 Blk 31 Original Town 100x140 0545 Blk/Tract 31 |
---|
33 | 39 | | 0.321 acres |
---|
34 | 40 | | Store #508] |
---|
35 | 41 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
36 | 42 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
37 | 43 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
38 | 44 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
39 | 45 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
42 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3800 was passed by the House on April |
---|
43 | | - | 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 10, 2 present, not |
---|
44 | | - | voting. |
---|
45 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
47 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3800 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
48 | | - | 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
51 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Date |
---|
53 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 46 | + | * * * * * |
---|