Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3807 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021