Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3807 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3807
1+By: Hunter, Herrero, Morales of Harris H.B. No. 3807
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2021;
4+ May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
5+ Resources & Economic Development; May 20, 2021, reported
6+ adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
7+ vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3807 By: Hinojosa
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the use of lifeguards and informational signs to
615 improve safety on public beaches.
716 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
817 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the Je'Sani Smith Act.
918 SECTION 2. Section 61.065, Natural Resources Code, is
1019 amended by adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
1120 (c) As part of the duty under this section to clean and
1221 maintain the condition of public beaches, a municipality shall:
1322 (1) during reasonable daylight hours, as established
1423 and posted by the municipality, from Memorial Day to Labor Day,
15- provide, or ensure that a park board created by the municipality
16- under Chapter 306, Local Government Code, provides:
24+ provide:
1725 (A) occupied lifeguard towers or mobile
1826 lifeguard units on each side of each pier, jetty, or other structure
1927 that protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within the
2028 corporate boundaries; or
2129 (B) a single occupied lifeguard tower or mobile
2230 lifeguard unit at each pier, jetty, or other structure that
2331 protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within the
2432 corporate boundaries if the single tower provides an unobstructed
2533 view of both sides of the structure; and
2634 (2) post within 100 yards of each side of each
2735 structure described by Subdivision (1) signs clearly describing the
2836 dangerous water conditions that may occur near the structure.
2937 (d) A municipality may suspend or alter the duties imposed
3038 under Subsection (c) during dangerous weather conditions or
3139 emergency operations.
3240 SECTION 3. Section 61.066, Natural Resources Code, is
3341 amended to read as follows:
3442 Sec. 61.066. DUTY OF COUNTY. (a) It is the duty and
3543 responsibility of the commissioners court of any county located or
3644 bordering on the Gulf of Mexico to clean and maintain the condition
3745 of all public beaches located inside the county but outside the
3846 boundaries of any incorporated city located or bordering on the
3947 Gulf of Mexico and all public beaches owned by the county and
4048 located inside the boundaries of an incorporated city, town, or
4149 village.
4250 (b) As part of the duty under this section to clean and
4351 maintain the condition of public beaches, a county shall:
4452 (1) during reasonable daylight hours, as established
4553 and posted by the county, from Memorial Day to Labor Day, provide:
4654 (A) occupied lifeguard towers or mobile
4755 lifeguard units on each side of each pier, jetty, or other structure
4856 that protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located on a public
4957 beach described by Subsection (a); or
5058 (B) a single occupied lifeguard tower or mobile
5159 lifeguard unit at each pier, jetty, or other structure that
5260 protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located on a public beach
5361 described by Subsection (a) if the single tower provides an
5462 unobstructed view of both sides of the structure; and
5563 (2) post within 100 yards of each side of each
5664 structure described by Subdivision (1) signs clearly describing the
5765 dangerous water conditions that may occur near the structure.
5866 (c) A county may suspend or alter the duties imposed under
5967 Subsection (b) during dangerous weather conditions or emergency
6068 operations.
6169 SECTION 4. Section 61.067, Natural Resources Code, is
6270 amended by adding Subsections (a-2) and (a-3) to read as follows:
6371 (a-2) As part of the duty under this section to clean and
6472 maintain the condition of public beaches located within state
6573 parks, the department shall:
6674 (1) during reasonable daylight hours, as established
6775 and posted by the department, from Memorial Day to Labor Day,
6876 provide:
6977 (A) occupied lifeguard towers or mobile
7078 lifeguard units on each side of each pier, jetty, or other structure
7179 that protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within a
7280 state park; or
7381 (B) a single occupied lifeguard tower or mobile
7482 lifeguard unit at each pier, jetty, or other structure that
7583 protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within a state
7684 park if the single tower provides an unobstructed view of both sides
7785 of the structure; and
7886 (2) post within 100 yards of each side of each
7987 structure described by Subdivision (1) signs clearly describing the
8088 dangerous water conditions that may occur near the structure.
8189 (a-3) The department may suspend or alter the duties imposed
8290 under Subsection (a-2) during dangerous weather conditions or
8391 emergency operations.
8492 SECTION 5. Subchapter A, Chapter 13, Parks and Wildlife
8593 Code, is amended by adding Section 13.023 to read as follows:
8694 Sec. 13.023. LIFEGUARDS AND SIGNAGE IN CERTAIN AREAS. (a)
8795 The department shall:
8896 (1) during reasonable daylight hours, as established
8997 and posted by the department, from Memorial Day to Labor Day,
9098 provide:
9199 (A) occupied lifeguard towers or mobile
92100 lifeguard units on each side of each pier, jetty, or other structure
93101 that protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within a
94102 state park; or
95103 (B) a single occupied lifeguard tower or mobile
96104 lifeguard unit at each pier, jetty, or other structure that
97105 protrudes into the Gulf of Mexico that is located within a state
98106 park if the single tower provides an unobstructed view of both sides
99107 of each structure; and
100108 (2) post within 100 yards of each side of each
101109 structure described by Subdivision (1) signs clearly describing the
102110 dangerous water conditions that may occur near the structure.
103111 (b) The department may suspend or alter the duties imposed
104112 under Subsection (a) during dangerous weather conditions or
105113 emergency operations.
106114 SECTION 6. The Parks and Wildlife Department is required to
107115 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
108116 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
109117 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
110118 purpose, that agency may, but is not required to, implement a
111119 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
112120 purpose.
113121 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
114- ______________________________ ______________________________
115- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
116- I certify that H.B. No. 3807 was passed by the House on April
117- 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 125, Nays 18, 1 present, not
118- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
119- No. 3807 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 10,
120- 1 present, not voting.
121- ______________________________
122- Chief Clerk of the House
123- I certify that H.B. No. 3807 was passed by the Senate, with
124- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays
125- 5.
126- ______________________________
127- Secretary of the Senate
128- APPROVED: __________________
129- Date
130- __________________
131- Governor
122+ * * * * *