House
|
05/04/2021
|
Postponed 6/1/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 10(b); Article III, Section 56
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Postponed 5/4/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Postponed 4/29/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|