Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB39 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis March 16, 2021