Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3912 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2021

                            87R11875 JXC-D
 By: Hinojosa H.B. No. 3912


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the weather emergency preparedness of gas facilities
 and facilities for providing electric service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 86, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 86.044 to read as follows:
 Sec. 86.044.  WEATHER EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS. (a) The
 commission by rule shall require an operator of a gas well to
 implement measures to prepare the well to operate during a weather
 emergency.
 (b)  The rules must be based on information from the National
 Weather Service and the Office of the Texas State Climatologist
 about:
 (1)  historic weather emergencies;
 (2)  climate variability; and
 (3)  projected changes in weather.
 (c)  The commission shall review and, if necessary, update
 rules adopted under this section at least once every five years to
 account for changes in the information described by Subsection (b).
 (d)  The rules must:
 (1)  require an operator of a gas well to implement the
 required measures at the expense of the provider; and
 (2)  require the provider to submit to the commission
 an annual report that shows the costs of implementing the required
 measures and that the costs were paid out of the operator's net
 profits.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 35, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 35.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 35.0021.  WEATHER EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS. (a) The
 commission by rule shall require each provider of generation in the
 ERCOT power region to implement measures to prepare generation
 facilities to provide adequate electric generation service during a
 weather emergency.
 (b)  The rules must be based on information from the National
 Weather Service and the Office of the Texas State Climatologist
 about:
 (1)  historic weather emergencies;
 (2)  climate variability; and
 (3)  projected changes in weather.
 (c)  The commission shall review and update rules adopted
 under this section at least once every five years to account for
 changes in the information described by Subsection (b).
 (d)  The rules must:
 (1)  require a provider of generation to implement the
 required measures at the expense of the provider; and
 (2)  require the provider to submit to the commission
 an annual report that shows the costs of implementing the required
 measures and that the costs were paid out of the provider's net
 profits.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 38, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.074 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.074.  WEATHER EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS. (a) The
 commission by rule shall require each electric cooperative,
 municipally owned utility, and transmission and distribution
 utility providing transmission or distribution service in the ERCOT
 power region to implement measures to prepare facilities to
 maintain service quality and reliability during a weather
 emergency.
 (b)  The rules must be based on information from the National
 Weather Service and the Office of the Texas State Climatologist
 about:
 (1)  historic weather emergencies;
 (2)  climate variability; and
 (3)  projected changes in weather.
 (c)  The commission shall review and update rules adopted
 under this section at least once every five years to account for
 changes in the information described by Subsection (b).
 (d)  The commission shall conduct a study on possible ways to
 provide funding for the measures required by the rules for
 transmission and distribution utilities so that the cost of the
 measures is not paid by retail customers. The commission shall
 submit the results of the study to the legislature not later than
 September 1, 2022. This subsection expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 4.  Section 121.2015, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d), (e), and (f) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The railroad commission shall adopt rules regarding:
 (1)  public education and awareness relating to gas
 pipeline facilities; [and]
 (2)  community liaison for responding to an emergency
 relating to a gas pipeline facility; and
 (3)  measures gas pipeline facility operators must
 implement to prepare gas pipeline facilities to maintain service
 quality and reliability during a weather emergency.
 (d)  The rules adopted under Subsection (a)(3) must be based
 on information from the National Weather Service and the Office of
 the Texas State Climatologist about:
 (1)  historic weather emergencies;
 (2)  climate variability; and
 (3)  projected changes in weather.
 (e)  The commission shall review and, if necessary, update
 rules adopted under Subsection (a)(3) at least once every five
 years to account for changes in the information described by
 Subsection (d).
 (f)  The commission shall conduct a study on possible ways to
 provide funding for the measures required by the rules adopted
 under Subsection (a)(3) so that the cost of the measures is not paid
 by retail customers. The commission shall submit the results of the
 study to the legislature not later than September 1, 2022. This
 subsection expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 5.  The Public Utility Commission of Texas and the
 Railroad Commission of Texas shall adopt the rules required by this
 Act not later than January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.