Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3932 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021