1 | | - | H.B. No. 3932 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Bernal, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3932 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3932 By: Menéndez |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the establishment of the State Advisory Council on |
---|
6 | 14 | | Educational Opportunity for Military Children. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 162.001, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 17 | | adding Subdivision (3) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (3) "State Advisory Council" means the State Advisory |
---|
11 | 19 | | Council on Educational Opportunity for Military Children |
---|
12 | 20 | | established under Section 162.006. |
---|
13 | 21 | | SECTION 2. Chapter 162, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 22 | | adding Section 162.006 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 23 | | Sec. 162.006. STATE ADVISORY COUNCIL AND COORDINATION. (a) |
---|
16 | 24 | | The compact commissioner, in coordination with the Texas Education |
---|
17 | 25 | | Agency, shall establish the State Advisory Council on Educational |
---|
18 | 26 | | Opportunity for Military Children to provide for coordination among |
---|
19 | 27 | | state agencies, school districts, and military installations |
---|
20 | 28 | | concerning the state's participation in and compliance with the |
---|
21 | 29 | | compact and compact activities, as required by Article VIII of the |
---|
22 | 30 | | compact. |
---|
23 | 31 | | (b) The State Advisory Council consists of: |
---|
24 | 32 | | (1) the commissioner of education or the |
---|
25 | 33 | | commissioner's designee; |
---|
26 | 34 | | (2) a superintendent of a school district with a high |
---|
27 | 35 | | concentration of military children designated by the agency; |
---|
28 | 36 | | (3) the governor or the governor's designee; |
---|
29 | 37 | | (4) the chair of the senate committee on education or |
---|
30 | 38 | | the chair's designee; |
---|
31 | 39 | | (5) the chair of the house of representatives |
---|
32 | 40 | | committee on public education or the chair's designee; |
---|
33 | 41 | | (6) a representative from each branch of the armed |
---|
34 | 42 | | services of the United States that maintains an installation in the |
---|
35 | 43 | | state, appointed by each respective branch; and |
---|
36 | 44 | | (7) representatives of other offices and stakeholder |
---|
37 | 45 | | groups the agency deems appropriate. |
---|
38 | 46 | | (c) Members of the State Advisory Council may delegate |
---|
39 | 47 | | voting authority to another person for a specified meeting or |
---|
40 | 48 | | meetings. |
---|
41 | 49 | | (d) Meetings of the State Advisory Council may be conducted |
---|
42 | 50 | | face-to-face or by telephone or other means of telecommunication or |
---|
43 | 51 | | electronic communication. |
---|
44 | 52 | | (e) The State Advisory Council shall: |
---|
45 | 53 | | (1) meet at least quarterly; and |
---|
46 | 54 | | (2) provide State Advisory Council meeting dates, |
---|
47 | 55 | | agendas, minutes, end-of-year reports, and other documentation as |
---|
48 | 56 | | required to the Military Interstate Children's Compact Commission. |
---|
49 | 57 | | (f) The State Advisory Council shall perform each function |
---|
50 | 58 | | or duty required or authorized under Article VIII of the compact. |
---|
51 | 59 | | (g) The State Advisory Council shall establish policies and |
---|
52 | 60 | | procedures governing the State Advisory Council's operations. |
---|
53 | 61 | | (h) The State Advisory Council is a governmental body for |
---|
54 | 62 | | purposes of Chapter 551, Government Code. |
---|
55 | 63 | | SECTION 3. Section 162.005, Education Code, is repealed. |
---|
56 | 64 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
59 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3932 was passed by the House on May |
---|
60 | | - | 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 111, Nays 32, 2 present, not |
---|
61 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
62 | | - | No. 3932 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117, Nays 27, |
---|
63 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
66 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3932 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
67 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
68 | | - | 0. |
---|
69 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
71 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Date |
---|
73 | | - | __________________ |
---|
74 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 65 | + | * * * * * |
---|