Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3949 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2021