Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3961 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021