1 | | - | H.B. No. 3961 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Spiller, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3961 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 17, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 17, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3961 By: Perry |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to required posting of information regarding the office of |
---|
6 | 14 | | the state long-term care ombudsman on certain long-term care |
---|
7 | 15 | | facilities' Internet websites. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
10 | 18 | | amended by adding Chapter 260C to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | CHAPTER 260C. POSTING OF OFFICE OF STATE LONG-TERM CARE OMBUDSMAN |
---|
12 | 20 | | INFORMATION BY CERTAIN FACILITIES |
---|
13 | 21 | | Sec. 260C.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "long-term |
---|
14 | 22 | | care facility" means: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (1) a nursing facility licensed under Chapter 242; |
---|
16 | 24 | | (2) an assisted living facility licensed under Chapter |
---|
17 | 25 | | 247; or |
---|
18 | 26 | | (3) any other facility providing care to residents who |
---|
19 | 27 | | are assisted by the state long-term care ombudsman established |
---|
20 | 28 | | under Subchapter F, Chapter 101A, Human Resources Code. |
---|
21 | 29 | | Sec. 260C.002. POSTING OF OFFICE OF STATE LONG-TERM CARE |
---|
22 | 30 | | OMBUDSMAN INFORMATION ON INTERNET WEBSITE. (a) Except as provided |
---|
23 | 31 | | by Subsection (b), a long-term care facility shall post on the |
---|
24 | 32 | | facility's Internet website information about the office of the |
---|
25 | 33 | | state long-term care ombudsman established under Subchapter F, |
---|
26 | 34 | | Chapter 101A, Human Resources Code, including: |
---|
27 | 35 | | (1) information regarding the office's role as an |
---|
28 | 36 | | advocate for residents of long-term care facilities; and |
---|
29 | 37 | | (2) the office's statewide toll-free telephone number. |
---|
30 | 38 | | (b) A long-term care facility: |
---|
31 | 39 | | (1) may comply with this section by posting the |
---|
32 | 40 | | required information on the Internet website of the facility's |
---|
33 | 41 | | parent company if the facility does not maintain a unique Internet |
---|
34 | 42 | | website; and |
---|
35 | 43 | | (2) is not required to comply with this section if the |
---|
36 | 44 | | facility and any parent company do not maintain an Internet |
---|
37 | 45 | | website. |
---|
38 | 46 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect January 1, 2022. |
---|
39 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
40 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
41 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3961 was passed by the House on April |
---|
42 | | - | 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1, 1 present, not |
---|
43 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
44 | | - | No. 3961 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, |
---|
45 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
48 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3961 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
49 | | - | amendments, on May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
50 | | - | 1. |
---|
51 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
53 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Date |
---|
55 | | - | __________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 47 | + | * * * * * |
---|