House | 05/13/2021 | Postponed 5/3/22 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Filed |