Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3973 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021