1 | | - | H.B. No. 3973 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Walle, Morales Shaw, Zwiener H.B. No. 3973 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance; |
---|
| 5 | + | May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
| 6 | + | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, |
---|
| 7 | + | sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3973 By: Nichols |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to a study on abandoned oil and gas wells in this state and |
---|
6 | 15 | | the use of the oil and gas regulation and cleanup fund. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. (a) A joint interim committee is created to |
---|
9 | 18 | | study abandoned oil and gas wells in this state and the use of the |
---|
10 | 19 | | oil and gas regulation and cleanup fund. |
---|
11 | 20 | | (b) The committee shall be composed of: |
---|
12 | 21 | | (1) five members appointed by the lieutenant governor; |
---|
13 | 22 | | and |
---|
14 | 23 | | (2) five members appointed by the speaker of the house |
---|
15 | 24 | | of representatives. |
---|
16 | 25 | | (c) The committee shall convene at the call of the presiding |
---|
17 | 26 | | officer. |
---|
18 | 27 | | (d) The committee has all other powers and duties provided |
---|
19 | 28 | | to a special or select committee by the rules of the senate and |
---|
20 | 29 | | house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301, Government |
---|
21 | 30 | | Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees on |
---|
22 | 31 | | administration. |
---|
23 | 32 | | (e) Not later than the 60th day after the effective date of |
---|
24 | 33 | | this Act, the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of |
---|
25 | 34 | | representatives shall appoint the members of the interim committee |
---|
26 | 35 | | created under this section. |
---|
27 | 36 | | (f) The committee shall: |
---|
28 | 37 | | (1) study matters related to abandoned oil and gas |
---|
29 | 38 | | wells in this state, including the costs associated with plugging |
---|
30 | 39 | | abandoned wells and bonding requirements imposed on owners or |
---|
31 | 40 | | operators of oil and gas wells; |
---|
32 | 41 | | (2) identify potential solutions to reduce the need |
---|
33 | 42 | | for general revenue spending to plug abandoned wells; |
---|
42 | 51 | | (4) evaluate and identify other sources of potential |
---|
43 | 52 | | revenue, including federal funds and other existing taxes and fees |
---|
44 | 53 | | paid to the benefit of the state which could be utilized to meet the |
---|
45 | 54 | | goals of the committee. |
---|
46 | 55 | | (g) The Railroad Commission of Texas shall provide |
---|
47 | 56 | | information to the committee necessary to conduct the study under |
---|
48 | 57 | | Subsection (f) of this section, including information related to: |
---|
49 | 58 | | (1) budget and performance measures of the commission |
---|
50 | 59 | | and fees and fines collected by the commission; and |
---|
51 | 60 | | (2) any regulatory or statutory changes needed to |
---|
52 | 61 | | assure adequate operating revenue for the commission, including |
---|
53 | 62 | | revenue used to plug abandoned oil and gas wells. |
---|
54 | 63 | | (h) Not later than December 1, 2022, the joint interim |
---|
55 | 64 | | committee shall report the committee's findings and |
---|
56 | 65 | | recommendations to the legislature. |
---|
57 | 66 | | (i) The committee is abolished and this section expires |
---|
58 | 67 | | January 1, 2023. |
---|
59 | 68 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
60 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
61 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
62 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3973 was passed by the House on April |
---|
63 | | - | 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 108, Nays 37, 1 present, not |
---|
64 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
65 | | - | No. 3973 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, |
---|
66 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
69 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3973 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
70 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays |
---|
71 | | - | 1. |
---|
72 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
74 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
75 | | - | Date |
---|
76 | | - | __________________ |
---|
77 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 69 | + | * * * * * |
---|