Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4005 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021