Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4076 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2021

                            87R12499 LHC-D
 By: White H.B. No. 4076


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a modernization plan for post-adjudication secure
 correctional facilities operated by the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department and a task force to evaluate those facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 203, Human Resources Code, is amended by
 adding Section 203.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 203.020.  PLAN TO MODERNIZE SECURE FACILITIES. (a)  In
 coordination with the regionalization plan described by Section
 203.017, the department shall develop and implement a plan to
 modernize the secure facilities operated by the department under
 Subtitle C.
 (b)  The plan must:
 (1)  provide for methods to:
 (A)  reduce the department's deferred maintenance
 costs;
 (B)  increase the energy efficiency of secure
 facilities;
 (C)  direct cost savings to pay for health care
 costs for children committed to the department;
 (D)  increase staffing efficiency; and
 (E)  increase correctional staff compensation;
 (2)  identify options for the department to contract
 with private sector vendors to build and maintain secure facilities
 to be leased by the department;
 (3)  require new facilities to meet the standards for
 secure correctional facilities published by the American
 Correctional Association; and
 (4)  require that new facilities be designed to:
 (A)  maximize the safety of correctional
 officers, facility staff, and children committed to the custody of
 the department;
 (B)  comply with any court-ordered remedy; and
 (C)  facilitate the rehabilitation and
 reintegration into society of children committed to the custody of
 the department.
 (c)  In developing the plan, the department shall consult
 with stakeholders and experts.
 (d)  New facilities built under the plan may only be named
 for juvenile correctional officers or staff who:
 (1)  were killed in the course of their employment with
 the department; or
 (2)  made significant contributions to public safety in
 this state.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  A task force is established under this
 section to conduct a thorough evaluation of the Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department's secure correctional facilities.
 (b)  The governor shall appoint to the task force in a number
 that the governor deems sufficient:
 (1)  members of the house of representatives and
 senate;
 (2)  local government officials; and
 (3)  juvenile justice stakeholders.
 (c)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the task force shall
 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the
 legislature recommendations regarding which secure correctional
 facilities operated by the Texas Juvenile Justice Department should
 be:
 (1)  renovated and continued in operation as a secure
 correctional facility by the Texas Juvenile Justice Department;
 (2)  renovated and used for a purpose other than a
 secure correctional facility by the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department; or
 (3)  repurposed by an entity other than the Texas
 Juvenile Justice Department.
 (d)  The task force established under this section is
 abolished December 1, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than January 1, 2022, the Texas
 Juvenile Justice Department shall develop the plan required by
 Section 203.020, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the governor shall make appointments to the task force
 created by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.