Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4094 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021