Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4094 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Frank (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 4094
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain procurements by the Department of Family and
 Protective Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2155.089(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  an enrollment contract described by 1 T.A.C.
 Section 391.183 as that section existed on September 1, 2015;
 (2)  a contract of the Employees Retirement System of
 Texas except for a contract with a nongovernmental entity for
 claims administration of a group health benefit plan under Subtitle
 H, Title 8, Insurance Code; [or]
 (3)  a contract entered into by:
 (A)  the comptroller under Section 2155.061; or
 (B)  the Department of Information Resources
 under Section 2157.068; or
 (4)  a child-specific contract entered into by the
 Department of Family and Protective Services for a child without
 placement.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2155.144(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies only to the Health and Human
 Services Commission, [and to] each health and human services
 agency, and the Department of Family and Protective Services. For
 the purposes of this section, the Department of Family and
 Protective Services is considered a health and human services
 agency.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *