2 | | - | (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) |
---|
3 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
4 | | - | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water, |
---|
5 | | - | Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by |
---|
6 | | - | the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 3 | | |
---|
9 | 4 | | |
---|
10 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 7 | | relating to a study and report on the water level of Falcon Lake in |
---|
13 | 8 | | Zapata and Starr Counties. |
---|
14 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 10 | | SECTION 1. STUDY. The Parks and Wildlife Department and the |
---|
16 | 11 | | Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall jointly conduct a |
---|
17 | 12 | | study on the water level of Falcon Lake in Zapata and Starr |
---|
18 | 13 | | Counties. The study must: |
---|
19 | 14 | | (1) evaluate the optimum water level for recreational |
---|
20 | 15 | | fishing on the lake; and |
---|
21 | 16 | | (2) examine the factors that contribute to or are |
---|
22 | 17 | | affected by the rise and fall of the lake's water levels, including |
---|
23 | 18 | | flood control, conservation, and hydroelectric power projects. |
---|
24 | 19 | | SECTION 2. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2022, the |
---|
25 | 20 | | Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas Commission on |
---|
26 | 21 | | Environmental Quality shall submit to the governor, lieutenant |
---|
27 | 22 | | governor, and speaker of the house of representatives a report that |
---|
28 | 23 | | includes: |
---|
29 | 24 | | (1) the findings of the study conducted under Section |
---|
30 | 25 | | 1 of this Act; and |
---|
31 | 26 | | (2) recommendations to achieve and maintain the |
---|
32 | 27 | | optimum water level for recreational fishing on Falcon Lake, |
---|
33 | 28 | | consistent with the purpose of the lake's construction. |
---|
34 | 29 | | SECTION 3. EXPIRATION DATE. This Act expires September 1, |
---|
35 | 30 | | 2023. |
---|
36 | 31 | | SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
37 | 32 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
38 | 33 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
39 | 34 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
40 | 35 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|