Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4204 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/19/2021

                            By: Guillen, King of Uvalde H.B. No. 4204
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report on the water level of Falcon Lake in
 Zapata and Starr Counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  STUDY. The Parks and Wildlife Department and the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall jointly conduct a
 study on the water level of Falcon Lake in Zapata and Starr
 Counties. The study must:
 (1)  evaluate the optimum water level for recreational
 fishing on the lake; and
 (2)  examine the factors that contribute to or are
 affected by the rise and fall of the lake's water levels, including
 flood control, conservation, and hydroelectric power projects.
 SECTION 2.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2022, the
 Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality shall submit to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, and speaker of the house of representatives a report that
 includes:
 (1)  the findings of the study conducted under Section
 1 of this Act; and
 (2)  recommendations to achieve and maintain the
 optimum water level for recreational fishing on Falcon Lake,
 consistent with the purpose of the lake's construction.
 SECTION 3.  EXPIRATION DATE. This Act expires September 1,
 2023.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *